Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain person from distributing, purchasing for sale, or selling products containing delta-8- or delta-10-tetrahydrocannabinol to an individual under the age of 21 years; requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission, in consultation with the State Department of Agriculture and other stakeholders, to study and make recommendations on the classification and regulation of tetrahydrocannabinols, other than delta-9-tetrahydrocannabinol, and certain other manufactured products; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1078
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cannabis - Regulation - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cannabis - Regulation - Medical Cannabis Definition and Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {433822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Cannabis - Regulation - Revisions
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {343926/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cannabis - Regulation - Medical Cannabis Definition and Study
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {233129/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {433822/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512
Text - Chapter - Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
(   10-108 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page