Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization
Sponsored by
Senator Mautz
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person, for the management of the deer population in the State, to sponsor, conduct, or participate in a certain contest in the State that has the objective of harvesting a female deer.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0934
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1452 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 3:14 PM
Click to return on the top page