Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Chief Medical Examiner – Access to Records – Attorney General
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner to provide the Attorney General or the Attorney General's designee with any record that the Attorney General or the Attorney General's designee requests for the purpose of conducting a legal compliance audit of potential bias in the operation of the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1074
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner – Access to Records – Attorney General
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2022 2/26/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page