Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Firearm Safety Devices
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for the purchase of certain firearm safety devices during the taxable year; making the credit refundable; requiring proof of purchase to be provided to the Comptroller for a firearm safety device for which an individual is claiming a credit; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793729/1
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793729/1
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Credit for Firearm Safety Devices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety – Firearms Dealers – Storage Vaults for Regulated Firearms
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793729/1 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793729/1 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Smith) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793729/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Credit for Firearm Safety Devices
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 10:04 PM
Click to return on the top page