Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Homeowner Utility Repair Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Homeowner Utility Repair Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to reimburse and provide grants to eligible customers for costs associated with eligible repairs; establishing the Homeowner Utility Repair Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to reimburse and provide grants to eligible customers for costs associated with eligible repairs; requiring the Governor to appropriate $500,000 for the Fund beginning in fiscal year 2024; and requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1271
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Homeowner Utility Repair Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563724/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Utilities - Homeowner Utility Repair Fund - Establishment
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {563724/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development - Homeowner Utility Repair Program and Fund - Establishment
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Economic Matters 33 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-2901 through 4-2904 )
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page