Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Childhood Exposure to Violence – Health and Social Impacts – Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Childhood Exposure to Violence Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup to develop a public awareness and prevention campaign relating to the health and social impacts of children exposed to violence; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations for the public awareness campaign to the Senate Finance and House Health and Government Operations Committees by December 1, 2022.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1377
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Childhood Exposure to Violence – Health and Social Impacts – Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/4/2022 12:17 PM
Click to return on the top page