Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing a Class L beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to a holder of a manufacturer's license; authorizing the license holder to hold another license or permit issued by the Board; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell or provide samples of certain beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; requiring the license holder to provide prepackaged snacks; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Senate 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2023 2/27/2023 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 3:13 PM
Click to return on the top page