Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement – Internet of Things Devices – Guidelines, Standards, and Purchasing Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to issue certain standards and guidelines for units of State government for the appropriate use and management of certain Internet of Things devices under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to review and revise its standards and guidelines at least once every 5 years to ensure that they are at least as comprehensive as the standards and guidelines adopted by the Director of NIST; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Procurement – Internet of Things Devices – Guidelines, Standards, and Purchasing Restrictions
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:21 PM
Click to return on the top page