Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Sponsored by
Senators Watson, Rosapepe, Lee, Smith, and Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person who undertakes the towing or removal of a vehicle from a parking lot to notify any secured party electronically if that form of notice is agreed to by the tower and the secured party in writing or by electronic communication.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0870
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {283228/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page