Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Athletic Trainers - Dry Needling Approval
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Physicians to approve licensed athletic trainers to perform dry needling, a certain type of intramuscular manual therapy involving the insertion of one or more solid needles or a mechanical device into the muscle and related tissues to effect change in the muscle and relate tissues, as a specialized task.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1016
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Licensed Athletic Trainers - Dry Needling Registration
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {843328/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Licensed Athletic Trainers - Dry Needling Approval
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
(   14-5D-10.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page