Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property - Recoupling With Federal Law
Sponsored by
Senators West and Hester
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing Maryland income tax modifications for certain deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0841
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2022
Legislative Date
2/05/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2022 2/05/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property - Recoupling With Federal Law
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/14/2022 11:05 AM
Click to return on the top page