Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law relating to the jurisdiction of the juvenile court, the juvenile intake process, and the placement of a certain child in detention or community detention; altering provisions of law relating to the authority of the juvenile court in making a disposition on a certain petition; specifying the authority of the juvenile court to place a child on probation under certain circumstances; requiring a certain report from the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733127/1
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {983521/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {983521/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {973721/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-42)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Reform
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {733127/1 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {733127/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Floor Amendment {983521/1 (Senator Hough) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hough) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {983521/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {973721/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Justice Reform
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Judiciary 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/20/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (92-42) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Justice Reform
(   9-3501, 9-3502 )
Last Updated: 6/16/2022 11:44 AM
Click to return on the top page