Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - Study on Environmental Impacts of Lead-Based Fuel Use by Aviation Industry
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to study the environmental impacts of the use of lead-based fuel in the State by the aviation industry and develop recommendations for mitigating the environmental impacts; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of the Environment - Study on Environmental Impacts of Lead-Based Fuel Use by Aviation Industry
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2022 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page