Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain vested former members of the Teachers' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System who meet certain criteria may commence receipt of a vested allowance while continuing certain employment with certain participating employers; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to accept certain forms that were timely submitted; requiring certain individuals to submit a certain affidavit regarding the submission of a certain form; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0929
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Teachers' Pension System - Vested Allowance - Break in Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {789638/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {903829/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (97-42)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {903829/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Teachers' Pension System - Vested Allowance - Break in Service
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {789638/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {903829/1 (Delegate Szeliga) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (97-42) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Floor Amendment {903829/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:09 AM
Click to return on the top page