Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to change the name of the Court of Appeals to be the Supreme Court of Maryland, to change the name of the Court of Special Appeals to be the Appellate Court of Maryland, to change the name of a Judge of the Court of Appeals to be a Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland, and to change the name of the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to be the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0885
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0393 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-12)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (38-7) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (124-12) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
Text - Chapter - Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:18 PM
Click to return on the top page