Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year, to install at least one video recording device in each self-contained special education classroom; requiring video recording devices to record self-contained special education classrooms and exclusion areas during school hours and during any time that the classroom or exclusion area is in use; prohibiting the use of a video recording device in bathrooms or in areas that students use to change clothing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0715
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:19 PM
Click to return on the top page