Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Admissions and Amusement Tax Exemption - Arts and Entertainment Districts
Sponsored by
Senators Corderman and Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting Washington County or a municipal corporation located in Washington County from imposing the admissions and amusement tax on gross receipts derived from any charge within an arts and entertainment district.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2022
Legislative Date
2/05/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2022 2/05/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington County - Admissions and Amusement Tax Exemption - Arts and Entertainment Districts
Senate 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/25/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page