Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Waiver Programs - Waitlist and Registry Reduction (End the Wait Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Guzzone, Griffith, Feldman, Kelley, Waldstreicher, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Hayes, Hershey, Jackson, Jennings, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, McCray, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop plans to reduce the waitlist or registry for certain waiver programs by 50% beginning in fiscal year 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2022
Legislative Date
2/05/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Waiver Programs - Waitlist Reduction (End the Wait Act)
Senate 2/05/2022 2/05/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {593323/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Waiver Programs - Waitlist and Registry Reduction (End the Wait Act)
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Waiver Programs - Waitlist and Registry Reduction (End the Wait Act)
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page