Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members - Active Status Points
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, under certain circumstances, certain service requirements for a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain volunteer fire, rescue, or emergency medical services members; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0888
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members - Active Status Points
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page