Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police to make a tow list of qualified towing companies for use by the Department in carrying out police-initiated towing of disabled or abandoned commercial vehicles and certain rate sheets available to the public on request; and establishing certain requirements and procedures for the police-initiated towing of certain commercial vehicles at the direction of the Department.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0487
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Vehicles – Nonconsensual Towing – Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423925/1
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Evening Session (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Commercial Vehicles – Nonconsensual Towing – Requirements
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {423925/1 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Special Order until Evening Session (Senator Salling) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {423925/1 Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16A-101 )
Last Updated: 4/21/2022 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page