Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring collateral source evidence made to or for the benefit of the plaintiff to be admissible in medical malpractice jury trials for a certain purpose; requiring the trier of fact to consider collateral source evidence when determining damages; requiring the court to deduct from any award recovered by the plaintiff any collateral source benefit that duplicates any benefit contained in the jury's award to the plaintiff; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page