Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Augustine, Beidle, Klausmeier, and Kramer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring residential service agencies receiving Medicaid reimbursement for the provision of home care or similar services by personal care aides to report by October 1 each year to the Maryland Department of Health the number of personal care aides classified by the agency as employees and independent contractors; and requiring the Department to use the reported information to create a certain report by July 1 each year, and submit the report to certain committees of the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-30)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {413420/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {143425/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (100-30) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Text - Chapter - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:23 PM
Click to return on the top page