Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Hough, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, Jackson, King, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of "absconding" as it relates to parole and probation, to include leaving an inpatient residential treatment facility in which an individual was placed under court order for drug or alcohol treatment without the permission of an administrator; requiring, for fiscal years 2024 through 2026, the Governor to include in the annual budget an appropriation of $2,000,000 for warrant apprehension grants; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer the grant funds.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Warrant Apprehension Reduction Grant
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {873224/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Warrant Apprehension Reduction Grant
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {253729/1 Adopted 40AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {873224/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted 40AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Judiciary 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:15 AM
Click to return on the top page