Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that if a landowner invites or permits on a limited entry basis, with or without charge, an individual to use the landowner's real property for hunting, the invited or permitted individual impliedly consents to adhere to every law, observe every safety precaution and practice, observe all property boundaries, take every precaution against fire, and assume all responsibility and liability for the individual's safety and property while hunting on the landowner's real property; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743727/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {803529/1 (Senator Ellis)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {803529/1 (Senator Ellis) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {323022/1 (Senator Ellis) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-20)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743727/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Griffith) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743727/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Floor Amendment {803529/1 (Senator Ellis) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {803529/1 (Senator Ellis) Withdrawn 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {323022/1 (Senator Ellis) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {403227/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Arikan) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (114-20) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Recreation on Private Land - Hunting
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page