Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Law Enforcement Agencies – Body–Worn Cameras
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor and Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain law enforcement agencies, on or before July 1, 2025, to require the use of body-worn cameras by certain law enforcement officers, subject to certain policies.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0591
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Contingency - a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Law Enforcement Agencies – Body–Worn Cameras
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety – Law Enforcement Agencies – Body–Worn Cameras
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page