Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Health Officers - Removal - Process
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Beidle, Feldman, Hettleman, Kelley, Sydnor, Washington, and Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law providing that a health officer serves at the pleasure of the Secretary of Health and the governing body of the county; establishing notice and hearing requirements related to a removal of a health officer from office; and prohibiting a health officer who appeals a certain decision of the Secretary from carrying out the duties of health officer while the appeal is pending.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0609
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443620/1
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443620/1
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {913424/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Health Officers - Removal - Process
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-39)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Reassigned to Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Lam) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Floor Amendment {913424/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Health Officers - Removal - Process
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (85-39) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:47 AM
Click to return on the top page