Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Imposing certain requirements on a person who takes possession of a catalytic converter, including requirements to record certain information and execute a certain document; prohibiting a person from taking possession of a catalytic converter if its identifying information has been manually altered; and prohibiting a person, in certain circumstances, from possessing catalytic converters or their parts if they have been previously installed on a motor vehicle.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   22-421 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page