Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Corderman, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Gallion, Griffith, Guzzone, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, Hough, Jackson, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Patterson, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, Watson, West, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing invoicing and prompt payment requirements for certain State grants.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0451
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783121/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page