Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Hester, Zucker, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Patterson, Pinsky, Ready, Rosapepe, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Carozza, McCray, and Salling
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Addressing infrastructure, capacity, and accessibility needs within the Maryland Park Service and State parks, including establishing systems and processes for surveying infrastructure and critical maintenance needs, increasing the number of Maryland Park Service full-time employees, requiring the Department of Budget and Management to conduct certain staff reviews, and requiring the Department of Natural Resources to develop a certain capital improvement plan and a comprehensive long-range strategic plan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0727
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {353326/1 (Senator Washington)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {353326/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {343823/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Floor Amendment {353326/1 (Senator Washington) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Floor Amendment {353326/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted 40AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {753929/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
(   5-1012, 5-204,   5-206,   5-210.1, 5-220 through 5-222, 5-2A-01 through 5-2A-05, 5-903,   5-9A-01   )
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page