Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Distribution System Planning Workgroup to study issues related to energy distribution planning and implementation; requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations on or before January 1, 2024, related to energy distribution planning and implementation; requiring the Commission and the Maryland Energy Administration to coordinate efforts with utilities to apply for certain federal funds; and establishing labor standards for contractors and subcontractors participating in certain projects.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0088
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2022
Legislative Date
1/29/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards
Senate 1/29/2022 1/29/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-801 through 7-805 )
Last Updated: 2/15/2022 6:01 PM
Click to return on the top page