Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Guzzone, and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Universal Health Care; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to develop a plan for the State to establish, on or before January 1, 2024, a universal health care program to provide health benefits to all residents of the State through a single-payer system; authorizing the Commission, the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, and the Maryland Department of Health to apply for certain waivers; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-4201 through 13-4203 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page