Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a will may be made self-proved in a certain manner; establishing certain requirements for a self-proving will; requiring a certain self-proving will to be acknowledged by the testator before a notary public; requiring a certain self-proving affidavit to be attached or annexed to a self-proving will; altering the requirements of an advance medical directive; requiring a declarant to acknowledge a certain advance medical directive before a notary public; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0203
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page