Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program in the Maryland Department of Labor for the purpose of providing matching grants to eligible employers for training programs attended by health care workers; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill and appropriation of at least $1,000,000 for the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0821
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543225/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text - Chapter - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
(   11-1501 through 11-1507 )
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page