Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions creating the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists Fund; and requiring the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists to pay money collected for its services into the General Fund of the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0065
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0673 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Appropriations 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 7:02 PM
Click to return on the top page