Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services – Secretary of Aging – Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain qualifications for an individual appointed as the Secretary of Aging; and requiring an individual appointed as the Secretary to have extensive experience and knowledge of laws, legislation, and regulations relating to aging, programs for aging individuals, a demonstrated commitment to the mission of both the Federal Older Americans Act and the Department, and hold at least a bachelor's degree.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 20, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services – Secretary of Aging – Qualifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services – Secretary of Aging – Qualifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Human Services – Secretary of Aging – Qualifications
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services – Secretary of Aging – Qualifications
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Griffith) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page