Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions and Licensure
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Beidle, Hettleman, and Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to provide certain information regarding the acquisition of a nursing home to the Office of Health Care Quality; requiring the Secretary of Health to consider the information before taking action regarding licensure to operate a nursing home; and requiring the Commission, in consultation with certain stakeholders, to study and make recommendations regarding the expansion of the certificate of need program over acquisitions of nursing homes and issue a report on or before December 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0702
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023, October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions and Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions and Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/31/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/25/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/24/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/03/2023
Legislative Date
5/03/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions and Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions and Licensure
Senate 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Favorable with Amendments {773124/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions and Licensure
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 50AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2023 3/31/2023 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2023 3/25/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2023 3/24/2023 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/03/2023 5/03/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text - Chapter - Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions and Licensure
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page