Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a court may appoint a guardian of the person of a minor if the court finds, by a preponderance of the evidence that the appointment is in the best interests of the minor, no testamentary appointment has been made, no parent is willing or able to serve as the minor's guardian, each parent consents to the appointment, or no parent files an objection to the appointment; and providing that the appointment of a guardian of the person of a minor does not require the termination of parental rights.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0808
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Favorable 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Smith) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Judiciary 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:16 PM
Click to return on the top page