Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Feldman, Guzzone, Carter, and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an assisted living program that was appointed as a representative payee for residents to report certain information, by June 1 each year, to the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General; requiring the Office of Health Care Quality in the Maryland Department of Health to notify the Division of the appointment of an assisted living program as a resident's representative payee within a reasonable period of time; requiring unfair trade allegations to be reported in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367377/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {846185/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {367377/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {846185/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
(   13-4B-01 )
Last Updated: 5/7/2021 3:21 PM
Click to return on the top page