Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the procedures for certain State Retirement and Pension System trustee elections; clarifying the survivor benefit for certain beneficiaries of certain retirees of the State Police Retirement System; exempting certain individuals who are retirees of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System from a certain earnings offset under certain circumstances; requiring service credit for certain members of the Employees' Pension System to be transferred to the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0744
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683325/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Referred Appropriations 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page