Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Term Limits and Commercial Bingo License
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting members of the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County from serving more than four consecutive terms; extending the term of a certain member of the Board; and authorizing the Board to issue a commercial bingo license to the owner of a licensed commercial bingo establishment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Term Limits
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {963125/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Term Limits and Commercial Bingo License
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Economic Matters 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Term Limits and Commercial Bingo License
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page