Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Elfreth, Augustine, Jackson, Kelley, Washington, Sydnor, Zucker, Guzzone, Pinsky, Lam, King, and Patterson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a procurement officer, in an invitation for bids or a request for proposals, to include a certain summary of the factors used to determine the expected degree of minority business enterprise participation for the contract; requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in collaboration with certain entities, to adopt by regulation criteria used to determine that a prime contractor has persistently failed to meet contract goals; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0389
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {303627/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page