Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Police - Collective Bargaining - Supervisors and Sergeants
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Benson, Hettleman, Jackson, King, Lam, Lee, Pinsky, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding sergeants and supervisors within the Maryland Transit Administration Police to the list of employees authorized to collectively bargain with the Maryland Transit Administration.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653424/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {563222/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration Police - Collective Bargaining - Supervisors and Sergeants
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {653424/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {653424/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {563222/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration Police - Collective Bargaining - Supervisors and Sergeants
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Appropriations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page