Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of certain employers to use certain leave with pay for bereavement leave; defining the term "bereavement leave" as leave an employee is allowed to use on the death of a member of the employee's immediate family; and defining the term "child" for purposes of certain bereavement leave to include an adopted, biological, or foster child, a stepchild, or a legal ward.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0056
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-37)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Economic Matters 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-37) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 7:22 PM
Click to return on the top page