Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Washington (By Request)
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the due date to December 31, 2021, by which the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties is required to submit a report on certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly; and extending the termination date for the Task Force to June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0763
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Judiciary 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page