Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Hershey, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority to impose, instead of or in addition to assessing a civil penalty, enforcement measures on persons that perform excavation or demolition without providing required notice.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2022
Legislative Date
1/29/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Senate 1/29/2022 1/29/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {993025/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Economic Matters 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-33) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text - Chapter - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page