Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers, Surviving Spouses, and Cohabitants
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a certain property tax credit for certain residential real property in Anne Arundel County owned by a certain disabled law enforcement officer or rescue worker, surviving spouse, or cohabitant; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0697
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0591 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers, Surviving Spouses, and Cohabitants
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/15/2022 4:55 PM
Click to return on the top page