Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to examine Maryland laws and compare to laws and practices in other states, and review any research analysis, or guidance related to laws of intestacy; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on possible revisions to the Maryland laws of intestacy to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2023.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/7/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page