Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a licensed title insurance producer to pay compensation for the provision of real estate brokerage services to associate real estate brokers, real estate salespersons, or certain business entities on behalf of a real estate broker in accordance with written disbursement authorization provided by the real estate broker.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0568
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Economic Matters 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Text - Chapter - Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons - Compensation - Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:22 PM
Click to return on the top page