Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Gas - Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement - Surcharge and Plans (STRIDE Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including infrastructure replacement project costs under the Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement Program in certain gas company base rates during a multiyear rate plan; and continuing an annual surcharge for eligible future infrastructure project costs not included in certain gas company base rates during a multiyear rate plan.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0890 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2022
Legislative Date
1/29/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Natural Gas - Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement - Surcharge and Plans (STRIDE Act of 2022)
Senate 1/29/2022 1/29/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page