Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Replacing references to Columbus Day in certain provisions of law with references to Indigenous Peoples' Day; and establishing that Indigenous Peoples' Day is to be observed on October 12 or, if the United States Congress designates another day for the observance of Columbus Day, the day designated by the United States Congress.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0157
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0895 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page